DC B22-0268 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-07 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill requires the Mayor's Office of Returning Citizens to maintain a database containing the names, location, and contact information for all DC residents held by the Federal Bureau of Prisons outside of the District and are expected to return within the following year; and, to assist returning citizens with obtaining information and services relating to housing, employment, transportation, and identification cards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Returning Citizens Opportunity To Succeed Amendment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-07CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-11-03CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-05-05CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0268 Published in the DC Register
2017-05-02CouncilReferred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2017-04-04CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback