DC B22-0262 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-17 - Law Number L22-0143 Effective from July 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill finds that a portion of the property at 405 53rd Street is no longer needed for public purposes, declares that portion as surplus property, and authorizes the Mayor to dispose of the land. The property is located in Ward 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

405 53rd Street, N.e. Disposition Act Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-17CouncilLaw Number L22-0143 Effective from July 17, 2018
2018-06-04CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2018-06-01CouncilAct A22-0370 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5978
2018-05-21CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0370
2018-05-21CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0370
2018-05-07CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 21, 2018
2018-05-01CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-04-10CouncilFirst Reading CC
2018-04-04CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-03-27CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0262
2017-12-11CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-12-08CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-11-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-05-05CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0262 Published in the DC Register
2017-05-02CouncilReferred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
2017-04-25CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback