DC B22-0257 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Law Number L22-0155 Effective from August 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Law 22-155 establishes the Green Finance Authority to increase private investment in clean and efficient energy, transportation and water. It establishes the Green Finance Authority Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

District Of Columbia Green Finance Authority Establishment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-28CouncilLaw Number L22-0155 Effective from August 22, 2018
2018-07-11CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2018-07-06CouncilAct A22-0395 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7159
2018-07-02CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0395
2018-07-02CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0395
2018-06-19CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 3, 2018
2018-06-05CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-05-01CouncilFirst Reading CC
2018-04-25CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-03-29CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0257
2017-07-14CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-06-30CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-06-09CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-05-05CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0257 Published in the DC Register
2017-05-02CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2017-04-25CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback