DC B22-0249 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Act A22-0063, Expires on August 17, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 4935
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Act A22-0063, Expires on August 17, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 4935
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
With Latin American Youth Center
Title
Modifications To Human Care Agreement No. Dcrl-2013-h-0039j With Latin American Youth Center Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | Council | Act A22-0063, Expires on August 17, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 4935 |
2017-05-19 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0063 |
2017-05-19 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0063 |
2017-05-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 24, 2017 |
2017-05-02 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-05-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-04-12 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |