DC B22-0244 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-22 - Law Number L22-0033 Effective from December 13, 2017, Projected Law Date is December 9, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-22 - Law Number L22-0033 Effective from December 13, 2017, Projected Law Date is December 9, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2018 Budget Support Act Of 2017
Title
Fiscal Year 2018 Budget Support Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Council - Amendment #1 (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Council - Amendment #2 (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Council - Amendment #1 (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Council - Amendment #2 (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-22 | Council | Law Number L22-0033 Effective from December 13, 2017, Projected Law Date is December 9, 2017 |
2017-10-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-10-30 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is December 9, 2017 |
2017-08-11 | Council | Act A22-0130 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7652 |
2017-07-31 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0130 |
2017-07-31 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0130 |
2017-07-18 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 1, 2017 |
2017-06-27 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Mendelson) |
2017-06-27 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2017-06-27 | Council | Amendment #2 (Gray) |
2017-06-27 | Council | Amendment #1 (Gray) |
2017-06-27 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-05-30 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0244 |
2017-05-30 | Council | First Reading CC |
2017-05-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0244 Published in the DC Register |
2017-04-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |