DC B22-0243 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Act A22-0057, Expires on August 15, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 4923
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Act A22-0057, Expires on August 15, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 4923
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
With Jacobs Project Management Co.
Title
Modification Nos. 001 And 002 To Contract No. Dcam-15-cs-0097e With Jacobs Project Management Co. Approval Emergency Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | Council | Act A22-0057, Expires on August 15, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 4923 |
2017-05-17 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0057 |
2017-05-17 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0057 |
2017-05-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 24, 2017 |
2017-05-02 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-05-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-04-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |