DC B22-0241 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-14 - Act A22-0098 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 6576
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-14 - Act A22-0098 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 6576
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2018 Federal Portion Budget Request Act Of 2017
Title
Fiscal Year 2018 Federal Portion Budget Request Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-14 | Council | Act A22-0098 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 6576 |
2017-07-10 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0098 |
2017-07-10 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0098 |
2017-06-28 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 13, 2017 |
2017-06-27 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-05-30 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0241 |
2017-05-30 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-05-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0241 Published in the DC Register |
2017-04-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |