DC B22-0240 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-22 - Law Number L22-0015 Effective from August 25, 2017, Expires on April 7, 2018, Projected Law Date is August 25, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-22 - Law Number L22-0015 Effective from August 25, 2017, Expires on April 7, 2018, Projected Law Date is August 25, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2017 Revised Budget Request Temporary Adjustment Act Of 2017
Title
Fiscal Year 2017 Revised Budget Request Temporary Adjustment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-22 | Council | Law Number L22-0015 Effective from August 25, 2017, Expires on April 7, 2018, Projected Law Date is August 25, 2017 |
2017-07-14 | Council | Act A22-0097 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 6568 |
2017-07-14 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is August 25, 2017 |
2017-07-10 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0097 |
2017-07-10 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0097 |
2017-07-06 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 20, 2017 |
2017-06-27 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-06-16 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0240 Published in the DC Register |
2017-06-13 | Council | First Reading |
2017-06-13 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Mendelson) |
2017-05-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-04-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |