DC B22-0237 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-27 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-27 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill requires the waiver of some parking infractions if the registered owner of the vehicle can prove that they did not receive notice of the infraction.
Title
Parking Ticket Waiver Act Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-27 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-10-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-04-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0237 Published in the DC Register |
2017-04-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2017-04-04 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0237 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/37826/B22-0237-Introduction.pdf |