DC B22-0234 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Act A22-0538 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 191
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Act A22-0538 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 191
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill prohibits the sale, offer for sale, or use of gasoline-powered leaf blowers in the District, beginning on January 1, 2022. A person who violates this order shall be subject to a fine of not more than $500.
FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Leaf Blower Regulation Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Council - Final reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-11 | Council | Act A22-0538 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 191 |
2019-01-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019 |
2018-12-26 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0538 |
2018-12-26 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0538 |
2018-12-13 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 28, 2018 |
2018-12-04 | Council | Final reading CC |
2018-11-20 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-13 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-10-16 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0234 |
2018-07-02 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-06-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-04-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0234 Published in the DC Register |
2017-04-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-04 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |