DC B22-0233 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0126 Effective from July 3, 2018, Projected Law Date is June 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0126 Effective from July 3, 2018, Projected Law Date is June 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes what reimbursement codes a telehealth provider must utilize to be eligible for reimbursement. It establishes the criteria and protocols that must be in place for remote patient monitoring services eligibility and reimbursement. Among other things, it requires the Department of Health Care Finance to seek Federal authorization where required to implement the Act.
FUNDING NOTE - This legislation is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement under "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Telehealth Medicaid Expansion Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Council | Law Number L22-0126 Effective from July 3, 2018, Projected Law Date is June 30, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is June 30, 2018 |
2018-05-11 | Council | Act A22-0345 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5110 |
2018-05-09 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0345 |
2018-04-24 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 8, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-03-06 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-02-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-02-12 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0233 |
2017-11-09 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-10-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-08-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-04-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0233 Published in the DC Register |
2017-04-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2017-04-04 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |