DC B22-0231 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Law Number L22-0062 Effective from February 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

This legislation requires the Department of Health Care Finance to explore the feasibility of bringing D.C. HealthCare Alliance coverage into the D.C. Health Benefit Exchange Authority's D.C. Health Link. It establishes how enrollees may re-certify if the Alliance program is brought under D.C. Health Link. It also aligns the D.C. HealthCare Alliance eligibility procedures with Medicaid enrollment. FUNDING NOTE - This legislation is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement under "Other Documents" tab.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department Of Health Care Finance D.c. Healthcare Alliance Amendment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16CouncilLaw Number L22-0062 Effective from February 17, 2018
2018-01-05CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2018-01-05CouncilAct A22-0223 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 9
2017-12-29CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0223
2017-12-13CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 28, 2017
2017-12-05CouncilFinal Reading CC
2017-11-07CouncilFirst Reading CC
2017-10-12CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2017-10-05CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0231
2017-05-19CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-04-28CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-04-07CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0231 Published in the DC Register
2017-04-04CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2017-04-04CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback