DC B22-0229 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0142 Effective from July 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Law 22-142 clarifies that homeowners associations, cooperative housing associations, and condominium associations may not disallow owners from installing or using a solar energy collection device unless the prohibition is expressed in the association's articles of incorporation. The bill permits exceptions for instances where the proposed installation would occur on common areas or elements and reasonable restrictions concerning size, location, and manner of installation of the solar energy collection device.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solar Cooperative Association Expansion Amendment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-10CouncilLaw Number L22-0142 Effective from July 17, 2018
2018-06-04CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2018-06-01CouncilAct A22-0369 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5975
2018-05-21CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0369
2018-05-21CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0369
2018-05-11CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 25, 2018
2018-05-01CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-04-10CouncilFirst Reading CC
2018-04-05CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-03-29CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0229
2017-12-13CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-11-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-04-07CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0229 Published in the DC Register
2017-04-04CouncilReferred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment
2017-04-04CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback