DC B22-0224 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Defending Access To Women's Health Care Services Emergency Amendment Act Of 2017
Title
Defending Access To Women's Health Care Services Emergency Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-04-28 | Council | Act A22-0049, Expires on July 23, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 4017 |
2017-04-24 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0049 |
2017-04-24 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0049 |
2017-04-07 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 24, 2017 |
2017-04-04 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-04-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |