DC B22-0202 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Law Number L22-0083 Effective from March 29, 2018, Projected Law Date is March 28, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Law Number L22-0083 Effective from March 29, 2018, Projected Law Date is March 28, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This legislation waives deed recordation, real property, and personal property taxes for eligible sites in Ward 7 and 8. To qualify for the exemption a business owner shall bi-annually certify that 50% of full-time employees are District residents and the business must be located at Skyland Town Center, Capitol Gateway, East River Park, St. Elizabeths East Campus, or United Medical Center.
FUNDING NOTE - This law was passed Subject to Appropriations. See Bill 22-754 for funding certification and Bill 22-753 for "Subject to Appropriations" repealer language
Title
East End Grocery And Retail Incentive Program Tax Abatement Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-09 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Council - Amendment (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Council - Amendment (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Council | Law Number L22-0083 Effective from March 29, 2018, Projected Law Date is March 28, 2018 |
2018-02-16 | Council | Act A22-0254 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 1586 |
2018-02-14 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is March 28, 2018 |
2018-02-07 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0254 |
2018-01-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 6, 2018 |
2018-01-09 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-01-09 | Council | Amendment (Gray) |
2017-12-05 | Council | First Reading CC |
2017-11-29 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-11-29 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0202 |
2017-05-08 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-04-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-04-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-31 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0202 Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2017-03-21 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |