DC B22-0183 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-08 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-08 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill requires insurers to pay a Council approved reimbursement rate to FEMS and its contracting providers so that FEMS and it's contractors will not need to require that the balance of the bill be paid by the insureds. It also creates a revenue fund to support reforms designed to improve emergency services.
Title
Affordable Emergency Transportation And Pre-hospital Medical Services Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-05-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-17 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0183 Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-03-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0183 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/37643/B22-0183-Introduction.pdf |