DC B22-0177 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Law Number L22-0109 Effective from June 5, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill establishes eligibility requirements for physicians to receive or renew an expedited medical license to practice medicine in multiple states and to share information with other member states to streamline the licensing process. It establishes the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Commission and authorizes the Mayor to join the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Approval Act Of 2017 (now Known As "interstate Medical Licensure Compact Enactment Act Of 2018")

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22CouncilLaw Number L22-0109 Effective from June 5, 2018
2018-04-23CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2018-04-13CouncilAct A22-0313 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 3809
2018-04-06CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0313
2018-04-06CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0313
2018-03-23CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 6, 2018
2018-03-07CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-03-06CouncilFinal Reading
2018-03-06CouncilAmendment (Mendelson)
2018-02-06CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0177
2018-02-06CouncilFirst Reading CC
2018-01-17CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-01-16CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0177
2017-12-06CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-10-27CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-03-10CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0177 Published in the DC Register
2017-03-07CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2017-03-07CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback