DC B22-0172 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0139 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0139 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes a Maternal Mental Health Task Force ("Task Force"), funded by the DC Department of Behavior Health, to provide comprehensive policy recommendations to improve maternal mental healthcare in the District.
FUNDING NOTE - This legislation is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement under "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Maternal Mental Health Task Force Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Council | Law Number L22-0139 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018 |
2018-06-04 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018 |
2018-06-01 | Council | Act A22-0366 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5966 |
2018-05-21 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0366 |
2018-05-21 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0366 |
2018-05-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-04-10 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-03-15 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-03-14 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0172 |
2017-11-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-10-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-08-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0172 Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2017-03-07 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |