DC B22-0171 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Law Number L22-0108 Effective from June 5, 2018, Projected Law Date is June 2, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Law Number L22-0108 Effective from June 5, 2018, Projected Law Date is June 2, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 22-108 establishes a program and supporting fund, the Senior Dental Services Program and the Senior Dental Services Program Fund, respectively, within the Department of Health to provide dental services for District seniors with an annual household adjusted gross income of $100,000 or less. The law establishes the program as a grant program, and specifies requirements for grantees and providers, the management of the Fund, and the payment of grants.
FUNDING NOTE - This legislation is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement under "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Senior Dental Services Program Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | Council | Law Number L22-0108 Effective from June 5, 2018, Projected Law Date is June 2, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is June 2, 2018 |
2018-04-13 | Council | Act A22-0312 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 3806 |
2018-04-06 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0312 |
2018-04-06 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0312 |
2018-03-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 6, 2018 |
2018-03-06 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-02-06 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-01-17 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-01-16 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0171 |
2017-10-25 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-10-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-08-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0171 Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2017-03-07 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |