DC B22-0169 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-01 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-01 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes that a video recording or other electronic record may be admissible as evidence of the following: the proper execution of a will (domestic or international), the intentions and mental capacity of a testator, the authenticity of a will, or matters that are determined by a court to be relevant to the probate of a will. It also provides a method of authentication for electronic signatures.
Title
Electronic Signature Authorization Act Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-05-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0169 Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-03-07 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0169 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/37592/B22-0169-Introduction.pdf |