DC B22-0154 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Law Number L22-0093 Effective from May 5, 2018, Projected Law Date is May 5, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill removes the requirement that persons with intellectual disabilities who are supported by the Department of Disability Services (DDS) be civilly committed in order to receive residential services. It repeals and amends existing law to bar new civil commitments of persons with intellectual disabilities. Persons who are already civilly committed will also have their commitments terminated unless that person or his or decision maker provides informed consent to the commitment at annual hearings. The bill also requires DDS to work with DC Superior Court to end civil commitments and creates a legal framework to facilitate the supported decision making that will replace civil commitments. Persons found incompetent to stand trial in a criminal case will continue to be civilly committed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Citizens With Intellectual Disabilities Civil Rights Restoration Act Of 2017 (now Known As "disability Services Reform Amendment Act Of 2018")

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25CouncilLaw Number L22-0093 Effective from May 5, 2018, Projected Law Date is May 5, 2018
2018-03-26CouncilTransmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is May 5, 2018
2018-03-23CouncilAct A22-0277 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2823
2018-03-12CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0277
2018-03-12CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0277
2018-02-28CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 14, 2018
2018-02-06CouncilFinal Reading
2018-01-09CouncilFirst Reading CC
2017-12-14CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2017-12-12CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0154
2017-06-15CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-05-12CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-03-10CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0154 Published in the DC Register
2017-03-07CouncilReferred to Committee on Human Services
2017-03-03CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback