DC B22-0137 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Act A22-0033, Expires on June 25, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 3089
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Act A22-0033, Expires on June 25, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 3089
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Wage Theft Prevention Clarification And Overtime Fairness Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2017
Title
Wage Theft Prevention Clarification And Overtime Fairness Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-31 | Council | Act A22-0033, Expires on June 25, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 3089 |
2017-03-28 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0033 |
2017-03-13 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 27, 2017 |
2017-03-07 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-03-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-03-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |