DC B22-0133 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill establishes which employers are required to provide paid-leave compensation to their employees and which employees meet the eligibility criteria for paid-leave compensation. It establishes the duration and amount of compensation for family leave, medical leave, and parental leave. It establishes notice requirements for employees and procedures regarding filing claims. It establishes the maximum weekly benefit amount of $1,000 before October 1, 2021 and increases the benefit amount proportionately pursuant to the Consumer Price Index thereafter. It also establishes the employees' right to appeal eligibility determinations to the Office of Administrative Hearings. It also provides that an eligible individual, the Attorney General of the District of Columbia, or the Mayor may bring civil action against any employer to enforce the provisions of this act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Universal Paid Leave Compensation For Workers Amendment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-10CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-08-04CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-03-07CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2017-03-03CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0133 Published in the DC Register
2017-02-21CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback