DC B22-0131 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill clarifies the contracting authority of OSSE and DCPS to purchase certain goods and services valued at $25,000 or less.
Title
Education Professional Development Contracting Authority Clarification Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-03-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-03 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0131 Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-22 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0131 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/37482/B22-0131-Introduction.pdf |