DC B22-0127 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Law Number L22-0086 Effective from April 25, 2018, Projected Law Date is April 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Law Number L22-0086 Effective from April 25, 2018, Projected Law Date is April 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 22-86 reestablishes the City Innovation Fund. The fund shall be overseen by the Deputy Mayor for Health and Human Services, but shall be a separate agency with a budget of $15 million annually, subject to appropriations.
FUNDING NOTE - This legislation is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement under "Other Documents" tab.
Title
City Innovation Fund Re-establishment Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-09 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Council | Law Number L22-0086 Effective from April 25, 2018, Projected Law Date is April 25, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is April 25, 2018 |
2018-03-02 | Council | Act A22-0258 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 2102 |
2018-02-07 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0258 |
2018-01-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 6, 2018 |
2018-01-09 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-01-09 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2017-12-05 | Council | First Reading CC |
2017-11-22 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-11-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0127 |
2017-11-01 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-10-13 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0127 Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-21 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |