DC B22-0125 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill provides for the issuance of parking permits to small businesses that are based in the District, have only one location and ten or less employees, and do not have controlled parking. Home-based businesses are excluded and the Mayor shall issue rules to implement the bill.
Title
Small Business Parking Permit Act Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-05-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0125 Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2017-02-21 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0125 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/37467/B22-0125-Introduction.pdf |