DC B22-0122 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-02 - Law Number L22-0049 Effective from January 25, 2018, Projected Law Date is January 20, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-02 - Law Number L22-0049 Effective from January 25, 2018, Projected Law Date is January 20, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 22-49 establishes a new program to be administered by the Department of Motor Vehicles (DMV). The law requires the program to operate at least one mobile customer service center capable of providing titling, licensing and tag processing, voter registration, and traffic ticket adjudication. It also specifies that the DMV must publish location data on its website to alert consumers on the daily location of the centers and the hours of operation for the centers.
FUNDING NOTE - This legislation is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement under "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Mobile Dmv Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-11-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - Council - First Reading (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - Council - First Reading (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | Council | Law Number L22-0049 Effective from January 25, 2018, Projected Law Date is January 20, 2018 |
2017-12-11 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is January 20, 2018 |
2017-12-08 | Council | Act A22-0197 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 12411 |
2017-12-01 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0197 |
2017-11-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 30, 2017 |
2017-11-07 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-10-03 | Council | First Reading |
2017-09-27 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-09-27 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0122 |
2017-06-16 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-05-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0122 Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2017-02-21 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |