DC B22-0107 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-29 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is March 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-29 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is March 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill requires campaign committees and candidates to obtain consent prior to using an individual's likeness, who is not a candidate for office, in campaign literature, advertisements, websites, or social media. It also requires campaign committees to retire all debts within 6 months after an election.
FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Campaign Finance Reform Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Allen) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-20 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-20 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-20 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-20 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is March 26, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Council | Act A22-0578 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 985 |
2019-01-18 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0578 |
2018-12-31 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 17, 2019 |
2018-12-04 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Allen) |
2018-12-04 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-11-20 | Council | First Reading |
2018-11-20 | Council | Amendment (Allen) |
2018-10-23 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-10-18 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0107 |
2017-07-10 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-05-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0107 Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-02-07 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |