DC B22-0105 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill provides home purchase assistance for police officers, firefighters, and emergency medical technicians. Assistance options include forgivable grants and District matching of saving increments. Participants must agree to a five-year service obligation.
Provisions incorporated into Bill 22-244, "Fiscal Year 2018 Budget Support Act of 2017" Title II, Subtitle B.
Title
First-responders Housing Incentive Program Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-03-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0105 Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2017-02-07 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0105 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/37358/B22-0105-Introduction.pdf |