DC B22-0096 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Law Number L22-0078 Effective from March 29, 2018, Projected Law Date is March 28, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Law Number L22-0078 Effective from March 29, 2018, Projected Law Date is March 28, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This legislation establishes the Electric Vehicle Charging Station Pilot Program which will place at least 15 publically-available electric vehicle charging stations in the District by January 1, 2019. The bill requires DDOT to transmit a publicly-available report to the Council regarding the results of the program and issuing recommendations based on its findings by January 1, 2020.
FUNDING NOTE - This law was passed Subject to Appropriations. See Bill 22-754 for funding certification and Bill 22-753 for "Subject to Appropriations" repealer language
Title
Electric Vehicle Public Infrastructure Expansion Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-09 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Council | Law Number L22-0078 Effective from March 29, 2018, Projected Law Date is March 28, 2018 |
2018-02-16 | Council | Act A22-0249 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 1560 |
2018-02-14 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is March 28, 2018 |
2018-02-06 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0249 |
2018-02-06 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0249 |
2018-01-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 6, 2018 |
2018-01-09 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-12-05 | Council | First Reading CC |
2017-11-29 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-11-29 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0096 |
2017-06-21 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-06-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-05-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0096 Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2017-02-07 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |