DC B22-0092 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 2 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-16 - Amendment (Mendelson) - withdrawn without consideration/vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill requires the Department of Consumer and Regulatory Affairs (DCRA) to monitor and investigate short term rentals for compliance with zoning regulations, building codes, health codes and housing codes among other things. DCRA must maintain records and statistics on licensed short-term rental activity. It creates a new license category for short-term rentals and procedures for enforcement actions. It also establishes penalties for violations. FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Short-term Rental Regulation And Affordable Housing Protection Act Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-16 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) - withdrawn without consideration/vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Council - Motion to postpone to 11/13/18 Legislative Meeting (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - Amendment - Allen (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-10-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-16CouncilAmendment (Mendelson) - withdrawn without consideration/vote
2018-10-16CouncilMotion to postpone to 11/13/18 Legislative Meeting
2018-10-02CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0092
2018-10-02CouncilAmendment - Allen
2018-10-02CouncilFirst Reading
2017-04-26CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-03-10CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-02-10CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0092 Published in the DC Register
2017-02-07CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2017-01-31CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback