DC B22-0072 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced this bill creates a tax credit for food donations to certain tax exempt non-profit organization. The credit equals 50% of the value of the contribution and shall not exceed $2,500 per taxpayer per tax year, or $5,000 per corporation per tax year. It expands liability protections for food donations. It requires that the Department of Health and the Office of Waste Diversion create a guide on food donation and also requires the Department of Health to train health inspectors on the information contained in the guide.
FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Save Good Food Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-16 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019 |
2018-11-23 | Council | Act A22-0513 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12927 |
2018-11-13 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0513 |
2018-11-13 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0513 |
2018-10-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 13, 2018 |
2018-10-16 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-10-02 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-09-26 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-09-26 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0072 |
2017-10-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-06-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0072 |
2017-03-28 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-03-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-27 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0072 Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-24 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2017-01-24 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |