DC B22-0068 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Law Number L22-0102 Effective from June 5, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill authorizes the District's personnel authority to automatically enroll all new District employees in the District's deferred compensation program at a contribution level of no less than 5%. Employees will be able to increase, decrease, or terminate the enrollment at any time. FUNDING NOTE - This law was passed Subject to Appropriations. See Bill 22-754 for funding certification and Bill 22-753 for "Subject to Appropriations" repealer language

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deferred Compensation Program Enrollment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Council - Amendment (Silverman) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22CouncilLaw Number L22-0102 Effective from June 5, 2018
2018-04-23CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2018-04-13CouncilAct A22-0303 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 3774
2018-04-04CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0303
2018-04-04CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0303
2018-03-22CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 5, 2018
2018-03-06CouncilAmendment (Silverman)
2018-03-06CouncilFinal Reading
2018-02-06CouncilFirst Reading
2018-01-09CouncilNot considered
2017-12-21CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2017-12-18CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0068
2017-10-16CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-09-29CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-01-27CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0068 Published in the DC Register
2017-01-24CouncilReferred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development
2017-01-23CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback