DC B22-0063 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill establishes a wireless network task force to provide policy recommendations on how the District can efficiently provide free wireless internet access throughout the District and construct and operate a municipal wireless network.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wi-fi Task Force Act Of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-10CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-06-16CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-01-27CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0063 Published in the DC Register
2017-01-24CouncilReferred to Committee on Government Operations
2017-01-10CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback