DC B22-0062 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Law Number L22-0066 Effective from March 6, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Law 22-66 establishes the District Health Literacy Council ("HLC"). The HLC is tasked with educating District residents on the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (commonly described as "Obamacare"). The law also requires the Mayor to develop and submit strategic plans to the Council regarding the advancement of health literacy education in the District's public education providers, including in workforce development programs, DCPS and charter schools, and public universities. FUNDING NOTE - This legislation is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement under "Other Documents" tab.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Literacy Council Establishment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-05 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16CouncilLaw Number L22-0066 Effective from March 6, 2018
2018-01-22CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2018-01-19CouncilAct A22-0230 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 354
2018-01-12CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0230
2018-01-12CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0230
2018-01-02CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 17, 2018
2017-12-05CouncilFinal Reading CC
2017-11-07CouncilFirst Reading CC
2017-10-12CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2017-10-05CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0062
2017-03-23CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-03-03CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-01-27CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0062 Published in the DC Register
2017-01-24CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2017-01-10CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback