DC B22-0060 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0138 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0138 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill prohibits restrictive land covenants or prohibitive contracts which prohibit the subsequent use of real property as a grocery store, on a site that is presently used as a grocery store. It provides an exception to an owner of a grocery store that relocates the grocery store within one-half mile of the previous site. For the exception to apply, relocation to the new site must occur within 2 years of the sale, transfer, or lease of the prior site and the restrictive covenant imposed on the prior site cannot exceed 3 years.
Title
Grocery Store Restrictive Covenant Prohibition Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Council | Law Number L22-0138 Effective from July 17, 2018, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018 |
2018-06-04 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is July 14, 2018 |
2018-06-01 | Council | Act A22-0365 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5964 |
2018-05-21 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0365 |
2018-05-21 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0365 |
2018-05-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-05-01 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2018-04-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-03-06 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-02-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0060 |
2017-11-28 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-10-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-27 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0060 Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-24 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-10 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |