DC B22-0053 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Law Number L22-0026 Effective from September 23, 2017, Projected Law Date is September 21, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-13 - Law Number L22-0026 Effective from September 23, 2017, Projected Law Date is September 21, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 22-26 designates the alley that runs east and west between the 600 blocks of Rhode Island Avenue, N.W., and S Street N.W., and the 1700 blocks of 6th and 7th Streets, N.W., in Ward 6, as Glick Court, in recognition of John H. Glick.
Title
Glick Court Designation Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-11 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Council - First Reading (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Council - First Reading (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-13 | Council | Law Number L22-0026 Effective from September 23, 2017, Projected Law Date is September 21, 2017 |
2017-08-11 | Council | Act A22-0139 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 7797 |
2017-08-10 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is September 21, 2017 |
2017-08-03 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0139 |
2017-07-19 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on August 2, 2017 |
2017-07-11 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-07-07 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-06-27 | Council | First Reading |
2017-06-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0053 |
2017-03-23 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-02-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-27 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0053 Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-24 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |