DC B22-0050 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Law Number L22-0010 Effective from August 1, 2017, Projected Law Date is July 29, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Law Number L22-0010 Effective from August 1, 2017, Projected Law Date is July 29, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 22-10 requires that all proposed child development facility regulations be submitted to the Council for a 45-day period of passive review.
Title
Child Development Facilities Regulations Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Council | Law Number L22-0010 Effective from August 1, 2017, Projected Law Date is July 29, 2017 |
2017-06-19 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is July 29, 2017 |
2017-06-16 | Council | Act A22-0071 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 5608 |
2017-06-05 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0071 |
2017-06-05 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0071 |
2017-05-30 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 13, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-05-02 | Council | First Reading CC |
2017-04-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-04-11 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0050 |
2017-03-30 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-02-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-25 | Council | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0050 Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-10 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |