DC B22-0047 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill prohibits District government contracts valued at $100,000 or more with businesses and individuals that have made contributions to District elected officials. The prohibition is for one year and begins on the date of the contribution as reported to the Office of Campaign Finance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Government Contractor Pay-to-play Prevention Amendment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-15CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-02-24CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-01-13CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0047 Published in the DC Register
2017-01-10CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2017-01-10CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback