DC B22-0045 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-14 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill expands felonies eligible to be sealed to include: failure to appear, theft, and felony possession. It also makes all misdemeanors eligible to be sealed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Record Expungement Amendment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-14CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-11-17CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-01-13CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0045 Published in the DC Register
2017-01-10CouncilReferred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2017-01-10CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback