DC B22-0042 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill excludes the annual salary of those employed with the Fraternal Order of Police Metropolitan Police Department Labor Committee and of those employed with the International Association of Fire Fighters, Washington D.C. Fire Fighters Association Local 36 from gross income.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

First Responder Income Tax Exclusion Amendment Act Of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-04-14CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-04-07CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-03-31CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-01-13CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0042 Published in the DC Register
2017-01-10CouncilReferred to Committee on Finance and Revenue
2017-01-10CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback