DC B22-0041 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill increases the number of sworn officers to 4,200. It also establishes the MPD Workforce Investment Fund to be administered by the Chief Financial Officer. It requires that the money in the Fund be used to support pay increases for sworn officers of the Fraternal Order of Police MPD Labor Committee.
Title
Force Of 4,200 – Police Officer Recruitment And Retention Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-03-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-13 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0041 Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-10 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-01-10 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0041 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/37197/B22-0041-Introduction.pdf |