DC B22-0037 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Law Number L22-0118 Effective from July 3, 2018, Projected Law Date is June 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill permits survivors of: domestic violence, stalking, sexual assault, and sexual trafficking to apply for confidential voter status. The confidentiality of their addresses shall be maintained by the Board of Elections. FUNDING NOTE - This law was passed Subject to Appropriations. See Bill 22-754 for funding certification and Bill 22-753 for "Subject to Appropriations" repealer language

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter Address Confidentiality Amendment Act Of 2017 (now Known As "address Confidentiality Act Of 2018")

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-10 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Council - Amendment (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-10CouncilLaw Number L22-0118 Effective from July 3, 2018, Projected Law Date is June 30, 2018
2018-05-21CouncilTransmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is June 30, 2018
2018-05-11CouncilAct A22-0337 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5064
2018-05-07CouncilSigned with Act Number A22-0337
2018-05-07CouncilEnacted with Act Number A22-0337
2018-04-24CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 8, 2018
2018-04-10CouncilFinal Reading
2018-04-10CouncilAmendment (Allen)
2018-03-06CouncilFirst Reading CC
2018-02-13CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-02-13CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0037
2017-04-06CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-03-10CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-01-13CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0037 Published in the DC Register
2017-01-10CouncilReferred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2017-01-10CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback