DC B22-0032 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-10 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-10 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill Identifies under which circumstances an expenditure made by a person controlled by or coordinated with a candidate, officeholder or political committee is considered a contribution to that candidate, officeholder or political committee.
Title
Clean Elections Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-10 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-05-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-13 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0032 Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-10 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-01-10 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0032 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/37188/B22-0032-Introduction.pdf |