DC B22-0008 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-10 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-10 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill precludes candidates, elected officials, affiliated committees, and their agents from encouraging donations to independent expenditure committee or a PAC. It also requires PACs and independent expenditure committees to certify that they have not received any donations that are coordinated with any candidate, official, political committee, or political party. Among other things, it requires that any expenditure coordinated with a candidate, campaign, or agent be treated as a contribution and it also applies restrictions on contributions to PACs on non-election years.
Title
Campaign Finance Transparency And Accountability Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-10 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-05-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-13 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0008 Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-10 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-01-05 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0008 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/37159/B22-0008-Introduction.pdf |