DC B22-0002 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-13 - Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0002 Published in the DC Register
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-13 - Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0002 Published in the DC Register
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill requires that beginning on January 1, 2018 DCRA housing and building infractions fines shall be adjusted according to the Consumer Price Index. It also doubles certain fines for certain infractions pertaining to housing and buildings.
Title
Dcra Infraction Fine Increase Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-13 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0002 Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-10 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0002 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/37129/B22-0002-Introduction.pdf |