DC B21-0896 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - Act A21-0513, Expires on January 25, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 13580
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - Act A21-0513, Expires on January 25, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 13580
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tipping contract with National Associates, Inc.
Leg. agenda 10/11/2016
Title
Modifications To Contract No. Cw22527 Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-11 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-04 | Council | Act A21-0513, Expires on January 25, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 13580 |
2016-10-27 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0513 |
2016-10-27 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0513 |
2016-10-14 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 28, 2016 |
2016-10-11 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-10-11 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2016-09-29 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |