DC B21-0878 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on September 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-29 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-29 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill prohibits an employer from screening prospective employees based on their wage history and also prohibits an employer from seeking the wage history of the prospective employee. Exceptions are if the employer has made an offer of employment with compensation and seeks such information for the sole purpose of confirming information about the prospective employee's wage history and the prospective employee has provided written authorization.
Title
Fair Wage Amendment Act Of 2016
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-29 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-09-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2016-09-23 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0878 Published in the DC Register |
2016-09-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole, Subcommittee on Workforce |
2016-09-20 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B21-0878 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/36412/B21-0878-Introduction.pdf |