DC B21-0807 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-29 - Act A21-0462, Expires on October 17, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 9841
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-29 - Act A21-0462, Expires on October 17, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 9841
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mandatory Driver Instruction Regulation Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2016
Title
Mandatory Driver Instruction Regulation Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-28 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-29 | Council | Act A21-0462, Expires on October 17, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 9841 |
2016-07-20 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0462 |
2016-07-20 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0462 |
2016-07-12 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2016-07-07 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 21, 2016 |
2016-06-28 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-06-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |