DC B21-0712 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-02 - Law Number L21-0144 Effective from August 19, 2016, Projected Law Date is August 19, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-02 - Law Number L21-0144 Effective from August 19, 2016, Projected Law Date is August 19, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 21-144 increases the minimum wage to $15.00 an hour in 2020 and increase the minimum wage during each successive year starting in 2021 in proportion to the increase in the Consumer Price Index. It increases the minimum wage for employees who receive gratuities to $5.00 an hour by 2020. It also requires the Mayor to submit a biannual compliance report to the Council.
Title
Fair Shot Minimum Wage Amendment Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-21 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) - Accepted as a friendly (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Grosso) - Accepted as a friendly (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Orange) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Allen) - Accepted as a friendly (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Grosso) - Accepted as a friendly (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Orange) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Allen) - Accepted as a friendly (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-02 | Council | Law Number L21-0144 Effective from August 19, 2016, Projected Law Date is August 19, 2016 |
2016-07-08 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is August 19, 2016 |
2016-07-08 | Council | Act A21-0429 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 9275 |
2016-06-27 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0429 |
2016-06-27 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0429 |
2016-06-24 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 11, 2016 |
2016-06-21 | Council | Final Reading |
2016-06-21 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) - Accepted as a friendly |
2016-06-07 | Council | Amendment (Orange) |
2016-06-07 | Council | Amendment (Grosso) - Accepted as a friendly |
2016-06-07 | Council | Amendment (Allen) - Accepted as a friendly |
2016-06-07 | Council | First Reading |
2016-06-01 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-06-01 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0712 |
2016-05-26 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-05-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2016-05-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business, Consumer, and Regulatory Affairs |
2016-04-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0712 Published in the DC Register |
2016-04-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |